open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:20-cv-10398
    Party Name:Cartier International AG et al v. City Styles 313, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacating Show Cause*]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default*]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute*]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?345117
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =