open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:20-cv-10397
    Party Name:Troy Public Schools v. K.F. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Brief]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?345116
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =