open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Michigan
    Case Number:1:16-cr-00220-1
    Party Name:USA v. Acosta-Buezo
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Waive Presentence Investigation Report and Impose Sentence]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waive Presentence Investigation Report and Impose Sentence]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendation Re Plea]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendation Regarding Plea]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Plea]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing (All)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment (Attorney)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Interpreter Appeared]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.miwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86045
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =