open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:20-31389-jda
    Party Name:Susan A. Whitman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sweet, Samuel D. [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?939737
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =