open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:20-48581-pjs
    Party Name:Antonio Lemons Allen
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [none]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gold, Stuart A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?939736
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =