open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Michigan
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00915
    Party Name:Davis et al v. Benson et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion & Order]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Pre-Motion Conference]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassignment/Disqualification]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?348463
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =