open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:20-21232-dob
    Party Name:Tamara K. Woidan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Order on Stipulation Excusing Entry of Third Party Payment Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Stipulation Excusing Entry of Third Party Payment Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [none]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Certificate of Service (batch)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McDonald, Thomas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?939738
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =