U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00027
  • Case Name: DISH Network L.L.C. v. Digital Success Network, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 10, 2022: [Contempt]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • August 23, 2022: [Appear]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Alternate Service]
  • August 16, 2022: [Alternate Service]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Alternate Service]
  • July 25, 2022: [Alternate Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.