U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-51225
  • Case Name: Keller v. Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment*]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • September 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Misc. Case - Initiating Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.