U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knuuttila
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (All)]
  • July 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment (Attorney)]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender (ND)]
  • July 27, 2022: [Rule 5(f) Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.