U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30324-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Broadnax
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
  • August 01, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.