U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30325-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Channing Brown
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 22, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • August 09, 2022: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 02, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.