U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-pt-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jansen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment for Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Final Supervised Release/Probation Violation Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment (Attorney) - Post Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Probation Petition and Order (Prob. 12(c) Form)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Accepting Jurisdiction (Prob. 22 Form)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.