U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30330-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tissue
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Dismissing Complaint*]
  • November 02, 2022: [Dismiss ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
  • October 28, 2022: [Appear*]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Adjourn]
  • October 24, 2022: [Adjourn]
  • October 20, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion - Free]
  • September 13, 2022: [Motion - Free]
  • September 12, 2022: [Motion - Free]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 22, 2022: [Revoke]
  • August 19, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 09, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 07, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2022: [Unseal]
  • August 05, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.