U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowditch
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • August 08, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 05, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.