U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-51267
  • Case Name: Massage Green International Franchise Corp. v Bunsey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Requiring Responsive Pleading*]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Alternate Service]
  • October 05, 2022: [Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*]
  • October 05, 2022: [Alternate Service]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*]
  • August 04, 2022: [Civil Case - Petition, Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.