U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30343-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Holmes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • August 16, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • August 15, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.