U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30344-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Corrow
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • August 17, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • August 17, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.