U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30351-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Soares
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Merged Case]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Motion - Free]
  • November 04, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • August 21, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.