U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-51349
  • Case Name: Coates v. Ford Motor Company et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
  • October 14, 2022: [Withdraw Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Appear*]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*]
  • August 22, 2022: [Misc. Case - Initiating Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.