U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30360-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Dupree
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.