U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-30363-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Collins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 16, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 16, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
  • August 25, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.