U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30362-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Horton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • August 25, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • August 25, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 25, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.