U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mc-51635
  • Case Name: In Re Hussian Saleh
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Correction]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Appear*]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Petition/Request/Application]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion - Free]
  • September 20, 2022: [Motion - Free]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Appointing Grievance Administrator and Referring Affidavit for Reinstatement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Appointing Three Judge Panel]
  • August 25, 2022: [Misc. Case - Notice of Attorney Discipline*]
  • August 25, 2022: [Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.