U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-51438
  • Case Name: Lipsey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Text-Only Order]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Appear*]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Appointing Grievance Administrator and Referring Affidavit for Reinstatement]
  • October 18, 2022: [Appointing Three Judge Panel]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Suspension/Disbarment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Misc. Case - Notice of Attorney Discipline*]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.