U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30390-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Rayford et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Dismissing Complaint*]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • September 15, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 14, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 14, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 14, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.