U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30394-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Pretrial Services Form 8]
  • October 06, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 28, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 20, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 19, 2022: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 16, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 16, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 15, 2022: [Unseal]
  • September 15, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.