U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30399-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Carter
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • November 04, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • November 04, 2022: [Reinstating and Continuing Bond]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Appear*]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Bond ]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Appear*]
  • October 06, 2022: [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Appear*]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • September 23, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • September 19, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 16, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 16, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.