U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-30401-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barajas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • September 22, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Unseal]
  • September 21, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 21, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.