U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30407-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jaquess
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • December 01, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • November 28, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • September 21, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.