U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-30402-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Etheridge
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 28, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 27, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.