U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30376-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 27, 2022: [Dismissing Complaint*]
  • December 19, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 18, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • September 30, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • September 29, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.