U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-30417-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ketner
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 05, 2022: [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
  • October 04, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • October 04, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • October 03, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.