U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-30416-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGlory et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • November 21, 2022: [Error]
  • November 20, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2022: [Motion - Free]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • October 13, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • October 12, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.