U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30444-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bullard
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • October 17, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • October 14, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.