U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30439-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BEARD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • October 17, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • October 14, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.