U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-51563
  • Case Name: Kelly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Reply to Response to Petition/Request/Application]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Petition/Request/Application]
  • December 09, 2022: [Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Change of Address/Contact Information]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Requiring Responsive Pleading*]
  • October 19, 2022: [Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*]
  • October 14, 2022: [Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.