U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30446-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Zarif
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Pretrial Services Form 8]
  • October 20, 2022: [Transferring Defendant to Answer Charges Pending in Another District]
  • October 20, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • October 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Petition for Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.