U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30460-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chu
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Merged Case]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Hearing on Motion*]
  • December 06, 2022: [Revocation of Detention Order]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • October 25, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.