U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:12-mj-30184-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • November 08, 2022: [Hearing on Motion*]
  • November 08, 2022: [Appear*]
  • November 03, 2022: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • October 28, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • October 27, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.