U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00448-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Braspenning
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Taking Motion Under Advisement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Ends of Justice Continuance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Holding Defendant For Proceedings Before The Grand Jury]
  • November 07, 2022: [Rule 5(f) Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment (Attorney)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.