U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30476-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Teagan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Request - other]
  • November 03, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • November 02, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • November 02, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.