U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-51648
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bitoff
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument*]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*]
  • November 02, 2022: [Return of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.