U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-30486-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ashford
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Dismissing Complaint*]
  • November 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 08, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • November 08, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • November 07, 2022: [Unseal]
  • November 07, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.