U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30488-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gomez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • November 11, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 10, 2022: [Correction]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Appear*]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Motion - Free]
  • November 09, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • November 09, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • November 08, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.