U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30492-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Keglar-Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Merged Case]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Hearing on Motion*]
  • November 22, 2022: [Bond ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • November 14, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • November 10, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.