U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00472-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice Cancelling Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Holding Defendant For Proceedings Before The Grand Jury]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2022: [Rule 5(f) Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment (Attorney)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.