U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30274-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Stipulation and Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • December 06, 2022: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • December 06, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2022: [Appointing Federal Community Defender]
  • December 05, 2022: [Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.