U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-30527-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Chokr
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Merged Case]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Stipulation and Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 03, 2023: [Regarding Brady Materials]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Error]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2022: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2022: [Criminal Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.