U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan

michigan Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00511-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment (Attorney)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 04, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Holding Defendant For Proceedings Before The Grand Jury]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Holding Defendant For Proceedings Before The Grand Jury]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (Initial Pretrial Matters)]
  • December 16, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment (Attorney)]
  • December 15, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment (Attorney)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Scheduling Progression of Case (Detention)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender (Doc)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 14, 2022: [Motion and Order to Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.